This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2021 at 02:46:41 (UTC).

KENNETH HARRIS VS CRANE CO.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 KENNETH HARRIS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CRANE CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0466

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS KENNETH

Defendant

CRANE CO. DBA CRANE AEROSPACE & ELECTRONICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAULSON RANDALL

Defendant Attorney

BLUMBERG ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/30/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/30/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

9/10/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

9/9/2020: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Crane Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Crane Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kenneth Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kenneth Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kenneth Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRANE CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUMBERG ROBERT S. ESQ.