This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 16:00:13 (UTC).

KENNETH FRASER, ET AL. VS STEVE SUNGHO LEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 KENNETH FRASER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEVE SUNGHO LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5019

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRASER KENNETH

GONZALEZ JACOB

Defendants

BIO HAZARD INC.

GREEN BUDDAH LLC

L & H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

L&HM LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

LAKHANY RAHEELA

LEE STEVE SUNGHO

SATTAR SHAFAQ ASLAM

SL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT I LLC

SL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT II LLC

SMOKE TOKES LLC

ST & COMPANY LLC

STELEE INDUSTRIES INC.

VO MINH V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELDMAN JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/5/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

5/5/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

5/5/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

5/5/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/5/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

5/5/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

5/5/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2025
  • Hearing05/01/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2023
  • Hearing10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kenneth Fraser (Plaintiff); Jacob Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kenneth Fraser (Plaintiff); Jacob Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kenneth Fraser (Plaintiff); Jacob Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STELEE INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT I LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GREEN BUDDHA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where L & H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant