This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 11:47:58 (UTC).

KENITH MURPHY VS INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 KENITH MURPHY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7104

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURPHY KENITH

Defendants

DE LEON ALBERTO

INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

KHAJAVI HEDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FRONTMAN SALLY SUE

Other Attorneys

COLLINS MANSFIELD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING AN OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

8/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING AN OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; CASE ...)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; CASE ...)

Notice of Ruling

9/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARVIN LAWTON

7/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARVIN LAWTON

Request for Judicial Notice

7/19/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

7/19/2021: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

7/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Proof of Personal Service

6/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

6/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/3/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions for entry of default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for entry of default; Case ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (AMENDED); Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (regarding an OSC re Proof of Service); Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (AMENDED); Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (AMENDED); Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kenith Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant