This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 13:31:42 (UTC).

KENDRICK EVANS, ET AL. VS LEONARDO APARTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 KENDRICK EVANS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LEONARDO APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1510

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANS KENDRICK

Defendants

LEONARDO APARTMENTS

LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/26/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR TYRIN

4/7/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR TYRIN

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

4/7/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR TYRIN

5/28/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR TYRIN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

6/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

7/23/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

7/23/2021: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

8/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal

9/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With prejudice, Complaint); Filed by Kendrick Evans (Plaintiff); Tyrin Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Kendrick Evans (Plaintiff); Tyrin Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Kendrick Evans (Plaintiff); Tyrin Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kendrick Evans (Plaintiff); Tyrin Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Tyrin); Filed by Kendrick Evans (Plaintiff); Tyrin Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kendrick Evans (Plaintiff); Tyrin Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Tyrin); Filed by Kendrick Evans (Plaintiff); Tyrin Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kendrick Evans (Plaintiff); Tyrin Harris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEONARDO APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O