This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2020 at 09:20:46 (UTC).

KEN MAREFAT ET AL VS BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 KEN MAREFAT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENNY C. OSORIO, ELAINE LU, DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0534

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BENNY C. OSORIO

ELAINE LU

DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

BAHRAMI NAHID ANNA

MAREFATE KEN

Respondents and Defendants

DOMINGUEZ VINCE

CARS RECOVERY INC

DOES 1 TO 50

BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA LLC

Not Classified By Court

ANTHONY J. CRAWFORD ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

CRAWFORD ANTHONY J. ESQ.

CRAWFORD ANTHONY JAMES

ENCARNACION ESTEFAN M.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MAVREDAKIS CRANERT

CRANERT MAVREDAKIS

RAO ARJUN P

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLETE ...)

8/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLETE ...)

Substitution of Attorney

6/26/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/26/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - AMENDED ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

4/24/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - AMENDED ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

4/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice of Ruling

4/25/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/2/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLETE ...)

3/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (LEGACY EVENT TYPE : OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLETE ...)

Notice - Notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Erick K. Kuylman

2/14/2019: Notice - Notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Erick K. Kuylman

Statement of the Case

3/1/2019: Statement of the Case

Declaration - re OSC Status of Service of Summons and Binding of Arbitration

9/4/2018: Declaration - re OSC Status of Service of Summons and Binding of Arbitration

Minute Order -

9/7/2018: Minute Order -

Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS KEN MAREFAT AND NAHID ANNA BAHRAMI AND C.A.R.S. RECOVERY, INC.

10/19/2018: Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS KEN MAREFAT AND NAHID ANNA BAHRAMI AND C.A.R.S. RECOVERY, INC.

Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal for failure to complete ...)

11/15/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal for failure to complete ...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

10/19/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/12/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

7/2/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

3/12/2018: Minute Order -

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • Hearing01/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal for failure to complete arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal for failure to complete arbitration) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal for failure to complete ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Ken Marefate (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Nahid Anna Bahrami (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Ken Marefate (Plaintiff); Nahid Anna Bahrami (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketAmended Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Ken Marefate (Plaintiff); Nahid Anna Bahrami (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Anthony James Crawford (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by BMW Financial Services, NA LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ken Marefate (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1) NGELIGENCE;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ken Marefate (Plaintiff); Nahid Anna Bahrami (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0534    Hearing Date: October 13, 2020    Dept: 32

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

Ken Marefat, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

BMW Financial services na, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****0534

Hearing Date: October 13, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to confirm arbitration award

Defendant BMW Financial Services NA, LLC (“Defendant”) moves to confirm the arbitration award in the underlying arbitration with Plaintiff Nahid Bahrami (“Plaintiff”). Per Code of Civil Procedure section 1285, any party to an arbitration may petition the court to confirm an arbitration award. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 1285.) The petition must be served on the other parties to the arbitration and must set forth the substance of or attach the arbitration agreement, include the name of the arbitrator, and attach a copy of the award and the written opinion of the arbitrator, if any. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 1285.4.)

The underlying arbitration award requires Plaintiff to pay Defendant $29,896.85. Defendant has submitted the arbitration agreement and a copy of the arbitration award to the Court. Plaintiff has not opposed the motion and there is nothing in the record constituting a reason why the Court should not confirm the award. Accordingly, the motion is granted. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: October 13, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARS RECOVERY, INC., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rao, Arjun P