This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 13:32:13 (UTC).

KEN JOHNSON, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 KEN JOHNSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3707

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNSON KEN

KJ TRUST

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHARLIN STEPHANIE ELYSE

NOYES CHRISTOPHER BRANDON

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF THIRTIETH PETITION FOR COORDINATION

8/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF THIRTIETH PETITION FOR COORDINATION

Answer

8/20/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/01/2021

9/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/01/2021

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/3/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/25/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF SUBMISSION OF THIRTIETH PETITION FOR COORDINATION); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ken Johnson (Plaintiff); KJ Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ken Johnson (Plaintiff); KJ Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ken Johnson (Plaintiff); KJ Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ken Johnson (Plaintiff); KJ Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ken Johnson (Plaintiff); KJ Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ken Johnson (Plaintiff); KJ Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLIN STEPHANIE ELYSE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOYES CHRISTOPHER BRANDON