Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2021 at 16:38:28 (UTC).

KEMPER INSURANCE COMPANY VS FRANCISCA ESCALANTE

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 KEMPER INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against FRANCISCA ESCALANTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0288

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEMPER INSURANCE COMPANY

Respondent

ESCALANTE FRANCISCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COLMAN JONATHAN H

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR CASE NUMBER

2/1/2021: Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR CASE NUMBER

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kemper Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kemper Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPetition (Petition for Case Number); Filed by Kemper Insurance Company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEMPER INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLEMAN JONATHAN