This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 05:33:52 (UTC).

KELWIN JONES VS MW AUTO SALES INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 KELWIN JONES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MW AUTO SALES INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8595

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES KELWIN

Defendants

MW AUTO SALES INC.

UNITED SURETY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOBASSERI ROBERT B.

Defendant Attorney

SIFERS JAMES STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Declaration re: Due Diligence

5/27/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/27/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/16/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

7/2/2021: Answer

Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/2/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/14/2021

9/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/14/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

9/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Case Management Statement

9/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

9/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

Case Management Statement

9/21/2021: Case Management Statement

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Non-Opposition); Filed by MW Auto Sales Inc. (Defendant); United Surety Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kelwin Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MW Auto Sales Inc. (Defendant); United Surety Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference (/Order to Show Cause ReDismissal for Failure to Serve and Prosecute) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 07:46 AM in Department 39; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 09/14/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by MW Auto Sales Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by United Surety Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kelwin Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Kelwin Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kelwin Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kelwin Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kelwin Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kelwin Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MW AUTO SALES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED SURETY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOBASSERI ROBERT B.