This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 00:45:44 (UTC).

KELVIN WRIGHT VS. STEARNS CONRAD AND SCHMIDT, CONSULTING...

Case Summary

On 03/02/2018 KELVIN WRIGHT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against STEARNS CONRAD AND SCHMIDT, CONSULTING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1666

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRIGHT KELVIN

Defendants

STEARNS CONRAD AND SCHMIDDT CONSULTING

OXMAN KLINEDINST PC ANDREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAWA LAW GROUP APC ZAHRA KHOURY ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by KELVIN WRIGHT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KLINEDINST PC (ANDREA OXMAN) (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by KELVIN WRIGHT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KELVIN WRIGHT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less