This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2023 at 04:45:25 (UTC).

KELVIN LAMAR GRANT, VS SYNCREON TECHNOLOGY (USA) LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2022 KELVIN LAMAR GRANT, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SYNCREON TECHNOLOGY USA LLC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6567

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANT KELVIN LAMAR

Defendants

ARROW WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS INC.

AWS INC.

CANADIAN EXECUTIVE SEARCH GROUP INC

CANADIAN EXECUTIVE SEARCH GROUP USA INC.

EMPLOYBRIDGE HOLDING COMPANY

EMPLOYBRIDGE LLC

PROLOGISTIX EXPRESS INC.

REAL TIME STAFFING SERVICES LLC

SYNCREON HOLDINGS LTD

SYNCREON TECHNOLOGY USA LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SAVOY GRANT JOSEPH

SOLOUKI SHOHAM JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

GITIG ERIC J.

HAGOPIAN DAVID G

JENSEN GARRETT VOORHEES

FRICK ROBYN ELISE

 

Court Documents

Joint Status Conference Report

11/13/2023: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference)

6/16/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference)

Joint Status Conference Report Joint Report Re Further Status Conference

6/5/2023: Joint Status Conference Report Joint Report Re Further Status Conference

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Cassandra Caldarella, CSR # 13127

3/3/2023: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Cassandra Caldarella, CSR # 13127

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

3/3/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Notice of Ruling Notice of Ruling on Defendants’ Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff’s Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims, and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA § 3 and CCP § 1281.4

3/3/2023: Notice of Ruling Notice of Ruling on Defendants’ Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff’s Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims, and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA § 3 and CCP § 1281.4

Reply (name extension) Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/9/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

Opposition (name extension) Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA § 3 and CCP § 1281.4

1/25/2023: Opposition (name extension) Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA § 3 and CCP § 1281.4

Notice (name extension) Defendants' Notice of Stay of Proceedings Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4 Pending Defendants' Application for an Order to Arbitrate

1/10/2023: Notice (name extension) Defendants' Notice of Stay of Proceedings Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4 Pending Defendants' Application for an Order to Arbitrate

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4

1/10/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4

Motion to Compel Arbitration Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims; Dismiss Class Claims and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4

1/10/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims; Dismiss Class Claims and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Jessica Sanchez in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4

1/10/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Jessica Sanchez in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Bonifacio Coronado in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4

1/10/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Bonifacio Coronado in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4

Notice (name extension) Notice of Entry of Order re Stipulation regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

11/22/2022: Notice (name extension) Notice of Entry of Order re Stipulation regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule For Defendants’ Motion To Compel Arbitration

11/18/2022: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule For Defendants’ Motion To Compel Arbitration

Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

11/1/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

Initial Status Conference Report Initial Status Conference Report

10/25/2022: Initial Status Conference Report Initial Status Conference Report

Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Employbridge, LLC, Employbridge Holding Company and Real Time Staffing Services, LLC

10/14/2022: Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Employbridge, LLC, Employbridge Holding Company and Real Time Staffing Services, LLC

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2023

DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Kelvin Lamar Grant, (Plaintiff); Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC. (Defendant); Employbridge, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 06/16/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketJoint Report Re Further Status Conference; Filed by: Kelvin Lamar Grant, (Plaintiff); Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC. (Defendant); Employbridge, LLC (Defendant); Employbridge Holding Company (Defendant); Real Time Staffing Services, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023

DocketStipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Cassandra Caldarella, CSR # 13127; Filed by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023

DocketNotice of Ruling on Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiffs Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims, and Stay PAGA Pursuant to FAA 3 and CCP 1281.4; Filed by: Employbridge, LLC (Defendant); Employbridge Holding Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023

DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 03/03/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
08/17/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elihu M. Berle in Department 6 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kelvin Lamar Grant, (Plaintiff); As to: Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC. (Defendant); Syncreon Holdings, LTD (Defendant); Arrow Workforce Solutions Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kelvin Lamar Grant, (Plaintiff); As to: Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC. (Defendant); Syncreon Holdings, LTD (Defendant); Arrow Workforce Solutions Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kelvin Lamar Grant, (Plaintiff); As to: Syncreon Technology (USA) LLC. (Defendant); Syncreon Holdings, LTD (Defendant); Arrow Workforce Solutions Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less