This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 18:39:52 (UTC).

KELTERITE CORPORATION VS PRECISION PIPELINE INCORPORATED, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 KELTERITE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRECISION PIPELINE INCORPORATED,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0188

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELTERITE CORPORATION

Defendants

EBERHART DAN K.

PRECISION PIPELINE INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINMOTO LYNN ASAYO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/16/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

4/29/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Kelterite Corporation on 03/16/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Kelterite Corporation as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action; Filed by: Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Precision Pipeline Incorporated (Defendant); Dan K. Eberhart (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Precision Pipeline Incorporated (Defendant); Dan K. Eberhart (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Precision Pipeline Incorporated (Defendant); Dan K. Eberhart (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Precision Pipeline Incorporated (Defendant); Dan K. Eberhart (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less