This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2020 at 09:00:15 (UTC).

KELTERITE CORPORATION VS PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 KELTERITE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0088

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELTERITE CORPORATION

Defendant

PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVIRIAN DONALD BIRGE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/27/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Lis Pendens

3/27/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/25/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

7/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less