This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2021 at 21:15:14 (UTC).

KELTERITE CORPORATION VS ONYX PAVING COMPANY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 KELTERITE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ONYX PAVING COMPANY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0449

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELTERITE CORPORATION

Defendants

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ONYX PAVING COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVIRIAN DONALD BIRGE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/12/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

8/2/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to the Entire Action without prejudice); Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONYX PAVING COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where KELTERITE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVIRIAN DONALD BIRGE