This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2022 at 17:29:00 (UTC).

KELTERITE CORPORATION VS H. ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 KELTERITE CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against H ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0222

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELTERITE CORPORATION

Defendants

ROBERTS KATHLEEN F.

H. ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVIRIAN DONALD BIRGE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/24/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/18/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOHN A. SMITH RE: UNDERLYING ACTION FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS AND PERSONAL GUARANTY

5/22/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JOHN A. SMITH RE: UNDERLYING ACTION FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT; COMMON COUNTS AND PERSONAL GUARANTY

Default Judgment

6/1/2020: Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/1/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF KATHLEEN F. ROBERTS

10/12/2021: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF KATHLEEN F. ROBERTS

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

1/11/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/11/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination (of Kathleen F. Roberts); Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of John A. Smith re: Underlying Action for Breach of Contract; Common Counts and Personal Guaranty); Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kelterite Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less