This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2023 at 07:00:01 (UTC).

KELTERITE CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL. VS RANDY P MORALES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 KELTERITE CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RANDY P MORALES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OLIVIA ROSALES. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1042

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

OLIVIA ROSALES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KELTERITE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KELTERITE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

J&J ORTEGA TRUCKING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MORALES RANDY P

REYNAGA TRANSPORTATION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEAUMONT NANETTE M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

6/22/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/1/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Order for Publication

3/13/2023: Order for Publication

Application for Publication

3/13/2023: Application for Publication

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANETTE M. BEAUMONT IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

3/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANETTE M. BEAUMONT IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

2/28/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Case Management Statement

2/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/7/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

1/27/2023: Summons - FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/26/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/17/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/5/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

10/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Complaint

10/18/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation, et al. on 10/18/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation and Kelterite, LLC, a California limited liability company as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action; Filed by: Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); Kelterite, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Randy P Morales (Defendant); J&J Ortega Trucking LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Reynaga Transportation Inc, a California corporation (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/09/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by: Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: J&J Ortega Trucking LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketOrder for Publication; Signed and Filed by: Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: J&J Ortega Trucking LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order for Publication: Filed By: Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Nanette M. Beaumont in Support of Application for Publication; Filed by: Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case, Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); Kelterite, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Randy P Morales (Defendant); J&J Ortega Trucking LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); Kelterite, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Randy P Morales (Defendant); J&J Ortega Trucking LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kelterite Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); Kelterite, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Randy P Morales (Defendant); J&J Ortega Trucking LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less