This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2022 at 20:05:40 (UTC).

KELSEY MCNEAL, ET AL. VS EDISON INTERNATIONAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 KELSEY MCNEAL filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against EDISON INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0160

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APPIER VILMA ISABEL

ARCHER GEORGINE

ARCHER ROBERT E

BARRON GLORIA TERRAZAS

BELL MARILYN

BENNER JUSTIN B

BRU ALBERTO

CARBAJAL JASMINE

CARBAJAL LILLIAN

CARBAJAL RAUL

CARCAMO JOSE ANGEL

CHORMICLE JAMES ROBERT

CHORMICLE SHARON ANN

CONRAD CATHERINE

CONRAD RICHARD

DIAZ-TERRAZAS SOFIA

FIELD DEBORAH GAYLE

FIELD DEVIN AARON

FIELD ROBERT CLIFFORD SR

Defendant

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOXER DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/3/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

2/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 02/02/2022

2/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 02/02/2022

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/24/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint); Filed by Edison International (Defendant); Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kelsey McNeal (Plaintiff); Stephanie McNeal (Plaintiff); Mary Ellen Moffett (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kelsey McNeal (Plaintiff); Stephanie McNeal (Plaintiff); Mary Ellen Moffett (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docketat 3:15 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 02/02/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum); Filed by Kelsey McNeal (Plaintiff); Stephanie McNeal (Plaintiff); Mary Ellen Moffett (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kelsey McNeal (Plaintiff); Stephanie McNeal (Plaintiff); Mary Ellen Moffett (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kelsey McNeal (Plaintiff); Stephanie McNeal (Plaintiff); Mary Ellen Moffett (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kelsey McNeal (Plaintiff); Stephanie McNeal (Plaintiff); Mary Ellen Moffett (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON ESQ JOHN