This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 01:35:37 (UTC).

KELLY ZBORALSKE VS GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 KELLY ZBORALSKE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STUART M. RICE, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1868

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STUART M. RICE

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZBORALSKE KELLY

Defendant

GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARQUEZ JUSTIN F

Defendant Attorney

WHANG DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

3/9/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Joint Status Conference Report - PARTIES' JOINT STATUS REPORT FOR MARCH 15, 2023 STATUS CONFERENCE

3/8/2023: Joint Status Conference Report - PARTIES' JOINT STATUS REPORT FOR MARCH 15, 2023 STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/30/2023

1/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/30/2023

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT:

1/27/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT:

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

1/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 01/24/2023

1/24/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 01/24/2023

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

1/19/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

1/19/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CCP 170.6 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/12/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

1/11/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

1/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

1/10/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Appearance

1/10/2023: Notice of Appearance

Initial Status Conference Report

1/6/2023: Initial Status Conference Report

Proof of Personal Service

10/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

10/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Parties' Joint Status Report for March 15, 2023 Status Conference: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Glendale Adventist Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketParties' Joint Status Report for March 15, 2023 Status Conference; Filed by: Glendale Adventist Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Parties' Joint Status Report for March 15, 2023 Status Conference: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Daniel Whang (Attorney): First Name changed from DANIEL to Daniel; Last Name changed from WHANG to Whang; Organization Name: Seyfarth Shaw LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAddress for Daniel Whang (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Setting Initial Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Setting Initial Status Conference) of 01/30/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kelly Zboralske (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale Adventist Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos in Department 9 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kelly Zboralske (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale Adventist Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kelly Zboralske (Plaintiff); As to: Glendale Adventist Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less