This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 16:45:39 (UTC).

KELLY, ROBERT VS KELLY, VICTORIA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 KELLY, ROBERT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KELLY, VICTORIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is POWELL, MICHAEL R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6270

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

POWELL, MICHAEL R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KELLY ROBERT

Respondent

KELLY VICTORIA

Not Classified By Court

ON-CALL LEGAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WALLER MARSHALL WILLIAM II

Respondent Attorney

BENNETT ROBERTA BELLE

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/14/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

7/14/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Declaration - UCCJEA

7/9/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Summons

7/9/2020: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/9/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

7/9/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Proof of Service of Summons

8/11/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Minute Order

9/29/2020: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order - to Consolidate

9/22/2020: Stipulation and Order - to Consolidate

Substitution of Attorney

9/18/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

10/5/2020: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Mail - of stipulation to consolidate cases and order thereon - filed 9/29/20

10/13/2020: Proof of Service - Mail - of stipulation to consolidate cases and order thereon - filed 9/29/20

Proof of Service - Mail

10/15/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Request - Refund

10/14/2020: Request - Refund

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

12/9/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Substitution of Attorney

5/11/2021: Substitution of Attorney

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketRefund Check Processed (Issued, 0029878267, 11/06/2020, SC20T016324 ); Filed by Depositor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketRefund Approved (First Paper Fee paid in consolidated case 20STFL07240 ); Filed by Depositor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketRefund Initiated (Receipt #ST-00114692-2020 dated 9/22/20 First Paper ); Filed by Depositor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest - Refund; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (of stipulation to consolidate cases and order thereon - filed 9/29/20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Consolidate ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ON CALL LEGAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLER MARSHALL WILLIAM II