This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 07:13:09 (UTC).

KELLY ANNA KLEIN VS MACIEL LUNA

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 KELLY ANNA KLEIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MACIEL LUNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK E. WINDHAM and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0422

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK E. WINDHAM

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KLEIN KELLY ANNA

Defendant

LUNA MACIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOSTER RICHARD M.

 

Court Documents

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

9/19/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/19/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT...)

9/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT...)

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF KELLY ANNA KLEIN

8/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF KELLY ANNA KLEIN

Request for Dismissal

8/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Application - APPLICATION COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF KELLY ANNA KLEINS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MACIEL LUNA

8/19/2022: Application - APPLICATION COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF KELLY ANNA KLEINS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MACIEL LUNA

Application - APPLICATION NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MACIEL LUNA AND SUMMARY OF THE CASE

8/19/2022: Application - APPLICATION NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MACIEL LUNA AND SUMMARY OF THE CASE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/19/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/18/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/18/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/4/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2024
  • Hearing01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • Hearing10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Mark E. Windham, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to File Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Default...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketApplication (NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MACIEL LUNA AND SUMMARY OF THE CASE); Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketApplication (COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF KELLY ANNA KLEIN?S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MACIEL LUNA); Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kelly Anna Klein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0422 Hearing Date: October 21, 2022 Dept: 29

Kelly Anna Klein v. Maciel Luna

Request for Court Judgment against Defendant Maciel Luna

Tentative: GRANT default judgment against Defendant Maciel Luna in the amount requested, i.e., $105,868.52.



Case Number: *******0422 Hearing Date: September 19, 2022 Dept: 29

Kelly Anna Klein v. Maciel Luna

Request for Court Judgment against Defendant Maciel Luna

Tentative: The Court has reviewed the default judgment and is CONTINUING the matter to allow Plaintiff to correct the following defects:

(1) Plaintiff seeks $3,375,000 in damages on her form CIV-100, but in the application, is seeking $105,868.52. Plaintiff must file a new CIV-100 form with the correct figure.

(2) Statement of damages that was served on Defendant must be filed with the Court.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOSTER RICHARD M. ESQ.