This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 11:29:15 (UTC).

KELLIE WILLIAMS, AS CO-TRUSTEE OF STONEHEDGE CAPITAL, A NEVADA TRUST, AUTHORIZED AGENT AND ASSIGNEE OF ALL OF THE CLAIMS AND VS BRIAN JENNINGS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO-MANAGING MEMBER OF GREEN COLLAR CANNABIS, LLC, A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPA

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 KELLIE WILLIAMS, AS CO-TRUSTEE OF STONEHEDGE CAPITAL, A NEVADA TRUST, AUTHORIZED AGENT AND ASSIGNEE OF ALL OF THE CLAIMS AND filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRIAN JENNINGS, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO-MANAGING MEMBER OF GREEN COLLAR CANNABIS, LLC, A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9444

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KELLIE WILLIAMS AS CO-TRUSTEE OF STONEHEDGE CAPITAL A NEVADA TRUST AUTHORIZED AGENT AND ASSIGNEE OF ALL OF THE CLAIMS AND DEFENSES OF AMCF ASSET MANAGEMENT TRUST A NEVADA TRUST

KELLIE WILLIAMS

Defendants

DAPT A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JJDS A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LATOURNAU GLEN

SIERRA MOUNTAIN MEDICAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION;

RHEE DAE K.

JERIMIAH RASMUSSEN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO-MANAGING MEMBER OF GREEN COLLAR CANNABIS LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND GCC ENTERPRISES LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NEUTRACUTICAL COMPOUNDING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BRIAN JENNINGS INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO-MANAGING MEMBER OF GREEN COLLAR CANNABIS LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND GCC ENTERPRISES LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RHEE MAL SOON

GREEN COLLAR CANNABIS LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GCC ENTERPRISES LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GCC ENTERPRISES LLC

GREEN COLLAR CANNABIS LLC

NEUTRACUTICAL COMPOUNDING INC.

DAPT

JERIMIAH RASMUSSEN

JJDS

SIERRA MOUNTAIN MEDICAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REZNICK MICHAEL E.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/15/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT JERIMIAH R...) OF 08/23/2021

8/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT JERIMIAH R...) OF 08/23/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT JERIMIAH R...)

8/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT JERIMIAH R...)

Order - Dismissal

9/1/2021: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED DEFENDANTS) OF 09/01/2021

9/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED DEFENDANTS) OF 09/01/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED DEFENDANTS)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED DEFENDANTS)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE...) OF 06/29/2021

6/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE...) OF 06/29/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE...)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

6/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Proof of Personal Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/22/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

6/23/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/24/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/04/2021

5/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/04/2021

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • Hearing10/29/2021 at 10:35 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDismissal of Defendant Jerimiah Rasmussen for Failure to Submit Default) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Kellie Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDismissal of Unserved Defendants) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal of Unserved Defendants)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal of Unserved Defendants) of 09/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (re Default of Defendant Jerimiah Rasmussen) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Default of Defendant Jerimiah R...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:42 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/04/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kellie Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kellie Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kellie Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIERRA MOUNTAIN MEDICAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REZNICK MICHAEL E.