This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 09:53:07 (UTC).

KELLEY JOHNSON VS YOLANDA ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 KELLEY JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOLANDA ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5003

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON KELLEY

Defendant

ALVAREZ YOLANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIAKANJA KRIST

Defendant Attorney

BARRENO ALEXANDRA

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/25/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

9/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

9/28/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/14/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2023
  • Hearing09/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Yolanda Alvarez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kelley Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kelley Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kelley Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kelley Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRENO ALEXANDRA