This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2022 at 12:51:23 (UTC).

KELLEY ESPINOSA VS BIG LOTS, INC., AN OHIO CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 KELLEY ESPINOSA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BIG LOTS, INC , AN OHIO CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0797

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPINOSA KELLEY

Defendants

BIG LOTS INC. AN OHIO CORPORATION

BIG LOTS STORES - PNS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA BIG LOTS #4066

BIG LOTS STORES LLC AN OHIO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HABASHY JOHN R.

Defendant Attorney

EVANS ELIZABETH ANN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/20/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/20/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer

10/24/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2024
  • Hearing09/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2024
  • Hearing03/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2024
  • Hearing03/05/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Big Lots Stores - PNS, LLC, a California limited liability company, (Defendant); As to: Kelley Espinosa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Filed by: Big Lots Stores - PNS, LLC, a California limited liability company, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kelley Espinosa (Plaintiff); As to: Big Lots Stores - PNS, LLC, a California limited liability company, (Defendant); Service Date: 09/22/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/05/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kelley Espinosa (Plaintiff); As to: Big Lots, Inc., an Ohio corporation (Defendant); Big Lots Stores, LLC, an Ohio limited liability company (Defendant); Big Lots Stores - PNS, LLC, a California limited liability company, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kelley Espinosa (Plaintiff); As to: Big Lots, Inc., an Ohio corporation (Defendant); Big Lots Stores, LLC, an Ohio limited liability company (Defendant); Big Lots Stores - PNS, LLC, a California limited liability company, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kelley Espinosa (Plaintiff); As to: Big Lots, Inc., an Ohio corporation (Defendant); Big Lots Stores, LLC, an Ohio limited liability company (Defendant); Big Lots Stores - PNS, LLC, a California limited liability company, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIG LOTS F&S INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BIG LOTS STORES INC A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HABASHY JOHN