This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2020 at 01:03:14 (UTC).

KEITH LEJSEK VS 7 ELEVEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 KEITH LEJSEK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 7 ELEVEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0866

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LEJSEK KEITH

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

7-ELEVEN

7-ELEVEN INC.

DOES 1-100

MARWAH GURBAX R.

LUCKY SEVENS INC.

PALM PLAZA INVESTMENTS LLC

ROES 1-100

Other

SHAPIRO DAVID B. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CHAMBERS GARY L. ESQ.

CHAMBERS GARY LEE ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAPIRO DAVID B.

HALUCK WILLIAM L.

SHAPIRO DAVID BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MARCH 25, 2020) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MARCH 25, 2020) OF 03/18/2020

Separate Statement

12/30/2019: Separate Statement

Notice - NOTICE FIRST AMENDED COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION

12/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE FIRST AMENDED COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/8/2020: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JU...)

1/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JU...)

Substitution of Attorney

11/12/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Separate Statement

10/30/2019: Separate Statement

Notice of Ruling

9/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

9/6/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Separate Statement

6/14/2019: Separate Statement

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

11/26/2018: Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, 7-ELEVEN INC. MOTION TO STRIKE

7/5/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, 7-ELEVEN INC. MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFENDANT 7-ELEVEN, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/18/2018: DEFENDANT 7-ELEVEN, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

4/4/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/4/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • Hearing07/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Hearing06/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:43 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: July 02, 2020) of 06/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: July 02, 2020)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Keith Lejsek (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Keith Lejsek (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Keith Lejsek (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by 7-Eleven (Defendant); 7-Eleven, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Keith Lejsek (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700866    Hearing Date: January 13, 2020    Dept: 5

Keith Lejsek v. 7-Eleven, et al.

Case No. BC 700866

The Court has no tentative order on this motion.  The Court orders any party who wishes to argue the motion to appear personally.  Any party who does not wish to argue and is merely observing the hearing may appear by court call.  Any party who does not appear shall waive their right to be heard and shall submit to any decision the Court makes on this motion.