This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 03:44:21 (UTC).

KEITH HUCKABY VS CRST EXPEDITED, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 KEITH HUCKABY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CRST EXPEDITED, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9128

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUCKABY KEITH

Defendants

CRST EXPEDITED INC.

CRST INTERNATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERENJI SHADIE L.

Defendant Attorney

MCNATT CHRISTOPHER CHAD JR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Initial Status Conference Order

8/17/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 08/17/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

8/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 08/17/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

8/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

Proof of Service by Mail

8/30/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Appearance

9/7/2021: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT)

9/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT) OF 09/30/2021

9/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT) OF 09/30/2021

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF THE PARTIES AND STATE COURT CLERK

9/30/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF THE PARTIES AND STATE COURT CLERK

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL)

3/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL) OF 03/28/2022

3/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVAL) OF 03/28/2022

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removal) of 03/28/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removal scheduled for 03/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 7 updated: Result Date to 03/28/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDefendants' Notice of Removal of the Parties and State Court Clerk; Filed by: CRST Expedited, Inc. (Defendant); CRST International, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removal scheduled for 03/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Removal to United States District Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 08/17/2021, Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Keith Huckaby (Plaintiff); As to: CRST International, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/11/2021; Service Cost: 82.35; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Keith Huckaby (Plaintiff); As to: CRST Expedited, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/11/2021; Service Cost: 167.35; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketAddress for Shadie L. Berenji (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Keith Huckaby (Plaintiff); As to: CRST Expedited, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Keith Huckaby (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Amy D. Hogue in Department 7 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRST INTERNATIONAL INC. AN IOWA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CRST Expedited, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERENJI SHADIE LATAE