Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 03:22:45 (UTC).

KEITH FOX, ET AL. VS FOOD PLUS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 KEITH FOX filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOOD PLUS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0872

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOX KEITH

DENHAM JORDAN

DOUCET LEATRICE

Defendants

FOOD PLUS AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

MAIDA RIAD

MAIDA HILDA

MAIDA RIAD DBA FOOD PLUS MARKET

Not Classified By Court

MOORE D'JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL

Defendant Attorney

SABAITIS FRANK T

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/5/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/21/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/21/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/21/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/21/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/21/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

12/21/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

12/21/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

12/21/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2023
  • Hearing12/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Hearing02/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Hearing02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer ((Riad Maida dba Food Plus Market's (erroneously sued as separate parties)); Filed by Riad Maida (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keith Fox (Plaintiff); Jordan Denham (Plaintiff); Leatrice Doucet (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keith Fox (Plaintiff); Jordan Denham (Plaintiff); Leatrice Doucet (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keith Fox (Plaintiff); Jordan Denham (Plaintiff); Leatrice Doucet (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Keith Fox (Plaintiff); Jordan Denham (Plaintiff); Leatrice Doucet (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Keith Fox (Plaintiff); Jordan Denham (Plaintiff); Leatrice Doucet (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Keith Fox (Plaintiff); Jordan Denham (Plaintiff); Leatrice Doucet (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Keith Fox (Plaintiff); Jordan Denham (Plaintiff); Leatrice Doucet (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Keith Fox (Plaintiff); Jordan Denham (Plaintiff); Leatrice Doucet (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Keith Fox (Plaintiff); Jordan Denham (Plaintiff); Leatrice Doucet (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL