This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 01:30:09 (UTC).

KEISHA JACKSON VS FAMILY DOLLAR INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by KEISHA JACKSON against FAMILY DOLLAR INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8915

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JACKSON KEISHA

Defendants and Respondents

FAMILY DOLLAR INC.

DOES 1-50

SANDOVAL MARIO (DOE #1)

SANDOVAL MARIO DOE #1

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

6/12/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/23/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/23/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

3/20/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

3/20/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial); Filed by Family Dollar, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Opposition (PLAINTIFF KEISHA JACKSON'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FAMILY DOLLAR, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by Keisha Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Keisha Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Keisha Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses) of 01/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Further Responses To RFP Set 1; Filed by Family Dollar, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Family Dollar, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Family Dollar, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Keisha Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Keisha Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698915    Hearing Date: November 19, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

keisha jackson,

Plaintiff,

v.

family dollar, inc.,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC698915

Hearing Date: November 19, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Motion to compel additional independent medical examinations

Plaintiff Keisha Jackson (“Plaintiff”) alleges that she slipped and fell in a store owned and operated by Defendant Family Dollar, Inc. (“Defendant”). Plaintiff asserts causes of action for negligence and premises liability. Now, Defendant requests an order compelling Plaintiff to submit to additional physical examinations with Mark J. Spoonamore, M.D. and Joshua P. Prager, M.D. Plaintiff contends that she has complex regional pain syndrome as a result of the accident and that she will require a spinal cord stimulator to reduce the pain from that condition. Due to the extent of Plaintiff’s alleged injuries and the alleged impact of those injuries, there is good cause for the additional examinations. Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. “The failure to file opposition creates an inference that the motion . . . is meritorious.” (Sexton v. Superior Court (1997) 58 Cal.App.4th 1403, 1410.) Therefore, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion to compel is granted. Plaintiff shall submit to physical examinations by Mark J. Spoonamore, M.D. and Joshua P. Prager, M.D. within thirty (30) days of notice unless Defendant stipulates to a different date. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: November 19, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court