This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2022 at 02:46:43 (UTC).

KEISHA BARRAGAN VS ORANGE COUNTY MEDICAL BILLING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 KEISHA BARRAGAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ORANGE COUNTY MEDICAL BILLING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5679

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRAGAN KEISHA

Defendant

ORANGE COUNTY MEDICAL BILLING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/30/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/12/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/10/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/9/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/9/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

9/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Request for Dismissal

10/10/2022: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Keisha Barragan on 08/09/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Keisha Barragan as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Keisha Barragan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by: Keisha Barragan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Keisha Barragan (Plaintiff); As to: ORANGE COUNTY MEDICAL BILLING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Keisha Barragan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kevin C. Brazile in Department 20 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Keisha Barragan (Plaintiff); As to: ORANGE COUNTY MEDICAL BILLING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Keisha Barragan (Plaintiff); As to: ORANGE COUNTY MEDICAL BILLING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Keisha Barragan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Keisha Barragan (Plaintiff); As to: ORANGE COUNTY MEDICAL BILLING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less