This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 15:29:43 (UTC).

KEILA RENEE JONES VS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 KEILA RENEE JONES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0239

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES KEILA RENEE

Defendants

ALBERTSON'S LLC

ABS CA-O LLC

ALBERTSON'S REALTY LLC

NEW ALBERTSONS L.P.

ALBERTSON'S STORES SUB LLC

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

SAFEWAY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARZBAN MICHAEL M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keila Renee Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keila Renee Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keila Renee Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keila Renee Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keila Renee Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keila Renee Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keila Renee Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Keila Renee Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Keila Renee Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Keila Renee Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABS CA-O LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSONS STORES, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant