Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2020 at 00:20:59 (UTC).

KEIKO TAKETOMI, AN INDIVIDUAL VS OSAMA ALZEINAT, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 KEIKO TAKETOMI, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OSAMA ALZEINAT, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9362

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAKETOMI AN INDIVIDUAL KEIKO

Defendant

ALZEINAT AN INDIVIDUAL OSAMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

KIM LEAH J.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

9/12/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/12/2019: Answer

Notice of Settlement

9/24/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

9/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 09/24/2019

9/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 09/24/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 12/18/2019

12/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 12/18/2019

Order - Dismissal

12/18/2019: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/3/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/19/2019: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 12/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire...) of 09/24/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Keiko Taketomi, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Osama Alzeinat, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Osama Alzeinat, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Keiko Taketomi, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Keiko Taketomi, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Keiko Taketomi, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Keiko Taketomi, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.