This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 12:50:51 (UTC).

KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, VS PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 KEESAL, YOUNG LOGAN, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0575

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEESAL YOUNG & LOGAN

Defendants

BERLIN MARK

GREENING MELANIE

PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS

PROSPECT FUNDING PARTNERS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEROVICH STEFAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/1/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/29/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Mail

12/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

4/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/09/2022

3/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/09/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Case Management Conference; Filed by KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docketat 09:39 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/09/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less