Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 00:56:45 (UTC).

KEENAN, JACQUELINE VS KEENAN, EDMUND ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 KEENAN, JACQUELINE filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against KEENAN, EDMUND ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VEASEY, GLENDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0018

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VEASEY, GLENDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEENAN JACQUELINE

Respondent

KEENAN EDMUND ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Miscellaneous - Evidence Packet

2/16/2021: Miscellaneous - Evidence Packet

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

2/19/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service

2/9/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/19/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/1/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 02/19/21 Dept J 8:30am

2/1/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 02/19/21 Dept J 8:30am

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

1/14/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

1/14/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Granted

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/14/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

1/14/2021: Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Evidence Packet ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hrg 02/19/21 Dept J 8:30am ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less