This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2022 at 13:18:51 (UTC).

KEENAN, HEATHER ZARINI VS KEENAN, HUGH TIMOTHY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 KEENAN, HEATHER ZARINI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KEENAN, HUGH TIMOTHY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SILBERMAN, HARVEY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1610

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SILBERMAN, HARVEY A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEENAN HEATHER ZARINI

Respondent

KEENAN HUGH TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

STERNBERG CAROL

 

Court Documents

Judgment Package Received - Stipulated - Rejected 4/19/2022

4/1/2022: Judgment Package Received - Stipulated - Rejected 4/19/2022

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

4/1/2022: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

4/1/2022: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Declaration - Default FL170

4/1/2022: Declaration - Default FL170

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

4/12/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated - Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated (Judgments)

4/27/2022: Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated - Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated (Judgments)

Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry - Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry (Judgments)

4/27/2022: Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry - Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry (Judgments)

Request - Judicial Notice - Request - Judicial Notice (Requests)

5/2/2022: Request - Judicial Notice - Request - Judicial Notice (Requests)

Request - Judicial Notice - Request - Judicial Notice (Requests)

5/2/2022: Request - Judicial Notice - Request - Judicial Notice (Requests)

Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration (Declarations)

5/3/2022: Responsive Declaration - Responsive Declaration (Declarations)

Minute Order

5/16/2022: Minute Order

Proposed - Stipulation and Order - Proposed - Stipulation and Order - $20.00 (Orders)

5/19/2022: Proposed - Stipulation and Order - Proposed - Stipulation and Order - $20.00 (Orders)

Stipulation and Order

5/23/2022: Stipulation and Order

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

3/30/2022: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Proof of Service - Mail

3/30/2022: Proof of Service - Mail

RFO/MTN - Family Law - Request To Pause Proceedings Due To Long Term Illness/Disability

3/30/2022: RFO/MTN - Family Law - Request To Pause Proceedings Due To Long Term Illness/Disability

Declaration - Circumstances Surrounding The Stipulated Dissolution Judgement

3/30/2022: Declaration - Circumstances Surrounding The Stipulated Dissolution Judgement

Minute Order

4/4/2022: Minute Order

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Silberman, Harvey A., Presiding; RFO - Family Law - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketResponsive Declaration (Responsive Declaration (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketRequest - Judicial Notice (Request - Judicial Notice (Requests) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (by mail with FL-117 attached ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Attachment to Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROL