This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 01:09:31 (UTC).

KEEGAN DAVIS, ET AL. VS ELITE FUNERAL AND CREMATION CENTER OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 KEEGAN DAVIS filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against ELITE FUNERAL AND CREMATION CENTER OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6566

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIS JERRY

DAVIS KEEGAN

PENNY KIMBERLY

Defendants

ELITE FUNERAL AND CREMATION CENTER OF CALIFORNIA

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/21/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/12/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/12/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/20/2022: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by St. Francis Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by St. Francis Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Keegan Davis (Plaintiff); Jerry Davis (Plaintiff); Kimberly Penny (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Keegan Davis (Plaintiff); Jerry Davis (Plaintiff); Kimberly Penny (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Keegan Davis (Plaintiff); Jerry Davis (Plaintiff); Kimberly Penny (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Keegan Davis (Plaintiff); Jerry Davis (Plaintiff); Kimberly Penny (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Keegan Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Keegan Davis (Plaintiff); Jerry Davis (Plaintiff); Kimberly Penny (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant