This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2019 at 08:01:45 (UTC).

KEATON MCGUIRE, ET AL. VS GRID ALTERNATIVES

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 KEATON MCGUIRE, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GRID ALTERNATIVES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8671

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PIPER EDWARD

ALLISON BRETT

MCGUIRE KEATON

Defendant

GRID ALTERNATIVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WONG GREGORY PHILIP

Defendant Attorneys

HOOD MICHAEL A.

LE KATHY A

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/16/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/16/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Initial Status Conference Order

9/4/2019: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 09/04/2019, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

9/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 09/04/2019, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

9/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/21/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/23/2019: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

11/18/2019: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • Hearing01/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Grid Alternatives (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Grid Alternatives (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:23 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 09/04/2019, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Keaton McGuire (Plaintiff); Brett Allison (Plaintiff); Edward Piper (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Keaton McGuire (Plaintiff); Brett Allison (Plaintiff); Edward Piper (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Keaton McGuire (Plaintiff); Brett Allison (Plaintiff); Edward Piper (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less