Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2021 at 02:50:00 (UTC).

KAYVAN HAYATI VS DAVIDOVITCH STEIN LAW GROUP LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 KAYVAN HAYATI filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against DAVIDOVITCH STEIN LAW GROUP LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0772

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAYATI KAYVAN

Defendants

DAVIDOVITCH STEIN LAW GROUP LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

BURGERIM 2020 CORP A DELAWARE CORPORATION

BURGERIM GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

BURGERIM GROUP USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LONI OREN

BUCHBUT MICHEL AKA MICHEL BOHBOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVIAN FARHAD

Defendant Attorneys

B.KLIER-ERLICH ESQ. RINAT

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint

Case Management Statement

4/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ON CONTINUATION OF MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/26/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ON CONTINUATION OF MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Substitution of Attorney

5/3/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

12/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

11/3/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order - ORDER ORDER

8/11/2020: Order - ORDER ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/7/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR SERVICE ON SOS RE BURGERIM GROUP USA

8/5/2020: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR SERVICE ON SOS RE BURGERIM GROUP USA

Answer

8/6/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/9/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • Hearing07/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Davidovitch Stein Law Group LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATION ON CONTINUATION OF MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (ON CONTINUATION OF MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Davidovitch Stein Law Group LLP, a California limited liability partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Joon Song); Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketApplication (Application for Service on SOS re Burgerim Group USA); Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kayvan Hayati (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVIDOVICH STEIN LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Burgerim Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVIAN FARHAD