This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 14:37:35 (UTC).

KAYLI BRUNELLE VS JOE GRECO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 KAYLI BRUNELLE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOE GRECO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1517

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRUNELLE KAYLI

Defendants

GRECO JOE

GRECO TANYA

Not Classified By Court

OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOBBS TIMOTHY K. II

Defendant Attorney

ROUSIER SUSAN

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LUCIANO SAERIM

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/18/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

8/31/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

8/31/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

9/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

9/17/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/17/2020: Answer

Notice of Lien

12/8/2020: Notice of Lien

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2023
  • Hearing08/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Hearing02/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Joe Greco (Defendant); Tanya Greco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Joe Greco (Defendant); Tanya Greco (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kayli Brunelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kayli Brunelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kayli Brunelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kayli Brunelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kayli Brunelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kayli Brunelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Old Republic Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCIANO SAERIM