This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2022 at 06:59:59 (UTC).

KAYE STEINSAPIR AN INDIVIDUAL AND SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO DECEDENT MOLLY STEINSAPIR, ET AL. VS RAD POWER BIKES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On August 1, 2022, Jonathan Steinsapir and Kaye Steinsapir (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), individually and as heirs and successors-in-interest to Decedent Molly Steinsapir, represented by Bagosy J. Renee, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Rad Power Bikes, Inc. and Rad Power Bikes, LLC (collectively, “Rad Power Bikes” or “Rad”), Giro Sport Design, Inc. (“Giro”), Bell Sports, Inc. (“Bell”), and Vista Outdoor, Inc. (“Vista”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages for the alleged death and injury of Molly Steinsapir. This case was filed in the Los Angeles County Superior Courts of California.  

In the complaint, Plaintiffs alleged that “in the late morning of January 31, 2021, Molly was riding as a passenger (wearing a Giro bike helmet) as her eleven-year-old best friend operated a new Rad Power Bikes RadRunner e-bike, a gift the friend’s older sister received just a month earlier. Molly sat behind her friend on the bike, the bike’s design invites a passenger to sit in tandem, with the passenger immediately behind the driver.”

Plaintiffs further alleged that “while coming down a steep hill—a hill that the two young girls would have never climbed with regular bicycles—the RadRunner began to shake and wobble, causing the bike to crash. The two girls were thrown from the vehicle to the hard concrete road. In the aftermath, Molly’s friend was rattled, in shock, and had numerous cuts and abrasions on her body. But she got up with only superficial physical injuries.”

Plaintiffs also alleged that “Molly was not so lucky. She was unconscious, not moving, and not responding. Heroically, Molly’s shocked friend flagged down a car to watch Molly as she rushed home to get her parents for help. When Molly’s parents arrived at the scene, at the same time as an ambulance, they saw their daughter with her head on the ground, helmet still on, unconscious, and unresponsive.”

Plaintiffs then allege that “Molly was rushed to Ronald Reagan UCLA Medical Center, arriving about an hour after the crash. Despite several brain surgeries and other treatment and care from some of the finest doctors and nurses in the country, Molly never regained consciousness. She passed away on February 15, 2021, about two weeks after her ride on the RadRunner.”

Plaintiffs additionally alleged that “Rad Power Bikes bears responsibility for the death of Molly Steinsapir due to their intentional and knowingly inappropriate marketing of e-bikes to children, failing to adequately warn about the dangers of children operating e-bikes, and due to the design defects in the RadRunner power bike, each of which was a substantial factor in causing the accident and Molly Steinsapir’s death. Further, Rad Bikes’ conduct was malicious, fraudulent, and oppressive.” 

Plaintiffs then alleged that “other Defendants in this case, manufactured, marketed and sold a bicycle helmet that was also defective. The purpose of a bicycle helmet is to absorb the impact of a crash, and the Giro brand helmet Molly was wearing cracked, but did not protect her from the brain injury that ultimately killed her. These Defendants’ actions were also a substantial factor in causing Molly Steinsapir’s death.”

Plaintiffs presented five claims for relief alleging product negligence, wrongful death, strict product liability, and breach of express and implied warranty.

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs requested damages and costs.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4714

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONATHAN STEINSAPIR AN INDIVIDUAL AND SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO DECEDENT MOLLY STEINSAPIR

KAYE STEINSAPIR AN INDIVIDUAL AND SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO DECEDENT MOLLY STEINSAPIR

Defendants

BELL SPORTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GIRO SPORT DESIGN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RAD POWER BIKES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

RAD POWER BIKES LLC A WASHINGTON LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VISTA OUTDOOR INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAGOSY JENNIFER RENEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/1/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KAYE STEINSAPIR an Individual and Successor-in- Interest to Decedent Molly Steinsapir (Plaintiff); JONATHAN STEINSAPIR, an Individual and Successor-in- Interest to Decedent Molly Steinsapir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KAYE STEINSAPIR an Individual and Successor-in- Interest to Decedent Molly Steinsapir (Plaintiff); JONATHAN STEINSAPIR, an Individual and Successor-in- Interest to Decedent Molly Steinsapir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KAYE STEINSAPIR an Individual and Successor-in- Interest to Decedent Molly Steinsapir (Plaintiff); JONATHAN STEINSAPIR, an Individual and Successor-in- Interest to Decedent Molly Steinsapir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vista Outdoor Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bell Sports Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Rad Power Bikes, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAGOSY JENNIFER RENEE