This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2022 at 04:04:46 (UTC).

KAWANA ANDERSON, VS BLACKSTONE CONSULTING, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 KAWANA ANDERSON, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BLACKSTONE CONSULTING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1450

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON KAWANA

Defendant

BLACKSTONE CONSULTING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/26/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/26/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 10/10/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

10/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 10/10/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

10/10/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service of Summons: Exact Name: Proof of Service of Summons ; As To Parties changed from Blackstone Consulting, Inc. (Defendant) to Blackstone Consulting, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kawana Anderson, (Plaintiff); As to: Blackstone Consulting, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/07/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference) of 10/10/2022, Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elihu M. Berle in Department 6 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kawana Anderson, (Plaintiff); As to: Blackstone Consulting, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kawana Anderson, (Plaintiff); As to: Blackstone Consulting, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kawana Anderson, (Plaintiff); As to: Blackstone Consulting, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKSTONE CONSULTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN