This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2022 at 14:35:55 (UTC).

KAWANA ANDERSON, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO THE CALIFORNIA PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERA VS BLACKSTONE CONSULTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 KAWANA ANDERSON, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO THE CALIFORNIA PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BLACKSTONE CONSULTING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1667

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES PURSUANT TO THE CALIFORNIA PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT KAWANA

Defendant

BLACKSTONE CONSULTING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/26/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kawana Anderson, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act (Plaintiff); As to: BLACKSTONE CONSULTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kawana Anderson, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act (Plaintiff); As to: BLACKSTONE CONSULTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kawana Anderson, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act (Plaintiff); As to: BLACKSTONE CONSULTING, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKSTONE CONSULTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ANDERSON, INC., THE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN