This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 23:01:48 (UTC).

KAVIEN AMIRI VS HAMID ALAVIAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 KAVIEN AMIRI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HAMID ALAVIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5474

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

AMIRI KAVIEN

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 35

ALAVIAN HAMID

ALAS HARDWOOD FLOORS INC

POWER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

AYALA ALEX

POWER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

SOKOLOFF STEVEN M. ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN M. SOKOLOFF

SOKOLOFF STEVEN MICHAEL

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LEGIS LAW PC

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP

HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

MACKEY ROBERT T

HARRIS CHARLES LANE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MAY 04, 2020) OF 03/30/2020

3/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MAY 04, 2020) OF 03/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MAY 04, 2020)

3/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MAY 04, 2020)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

2/27/2020: Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT)

3/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT) OF 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT) OF 03/24/2020

Notice of Ruling

11/18/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

11/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION EX PARTE CONTINUE TRIAL

11/7/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION EX PARTE CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/8/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...) OF 10/29/2019

10/29/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...) OF 10/29/2019

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES

10/29/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

10/29/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

Proof of Service by Mail

7/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)

8/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

8/9/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • Hearing12/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Hearing08/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Hearing08/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial ((1st)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docketat 11:05 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice (of continuance on Defendant's Motion for Leave to file cross-complaint); Filed by HAMID ALAVIAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ALEX AYALA AND HARDWOOD FLOORS INC ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF S KAVIEN AMIRI COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF KAVIEN AMIKI S NOTICE OF POSTING AND POSTING OF JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON ALL DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by KAVIEN AMIRI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by KAVIEN AMIRI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by KAVIEN AMIRI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KAVIEN AMIRI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE (2) PREMISES LIABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5474    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

kavien amiri,

Plaintiff,

v.

hamid alavian, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****5474

Hearing Date: November 14, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Defendant’s MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Defendant Hamid Alavian (“Defendant”) moves to continue the trial date, currently set for December 4, 2019, to May 4, 2020. Defendant seeks a trial continuance to permit mediation. The parties stipulated to pursue mediation, and the first date on which all parties and their chosen mediator are available is March 10, 2020, which is after the current trial date. This is a valid basis for a trial continuance. Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. Accordingly, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court grants Defendant’s motion for a continuance. The trial date, currently set for December 4, 2019, is advanced to this date and vacated. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: April 22, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial Date: May 4, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be governed by the new trial date. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: November 14, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POWER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. A CORPORATION DBA POWER PROPERTY GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOKOLOFF STEVEN M. ESQ.