Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 20:55:59 (UTC).

KAUFMAN, JONATHAN VS KAUFMAN, AMORET

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 KAUFMAN, JONATHAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KAUFMAN, AMORET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3822

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KAUFMAN JONATHAN

Respondent

KAUFMAN AMORET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHEN STEPHEN K

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

10/14/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - UCCJEA

9/28/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/28/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

9/28/2020: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/12/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons

6/8/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

6/8/2020: Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

Declaration - UCCJEA

4/29/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/29/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

4/29/2020: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

4/29/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/30/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

4/30/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEN STEPHEN K