This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2022 at 04:24:55 (UTC).

KATRINA SMITH, AN INDIVIDUAL, VS BEVERLY HILLS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 KATRINA SMITH, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BEVERLY HILLS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3318

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH AN INDIVIDUAL KATRINA

Defendants

BEVERLY HILLS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK D. AARON

Defendant Attorney

CHUN ARANG

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/27/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/09/2022

6/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/09/2022

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/14/2022: Answer

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • Hearing09/05/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • Hearing08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 06/09/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Beverly Hills Unified School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Beverly Hills Unified School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Katrina Smith, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Katrina Smith, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Beverly Hills Unified School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Katrina Smith, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Katrina Smith, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Katrina Smith, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Katrina Smith, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROCK D. AARON