This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 21:04:23 (UTC).

KATRINA MILLET VS BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 KATRINA MILLET filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5075

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLET KATRINA

Defendant

BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYON GEOFFREY C

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARDSON LYNE A.

TURNER BRITTNEY LYNNE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CA...)

2/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CA...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/28/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Status Conference Statement

2/1/2022: Status Conference Statement

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUSSTATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANT'SDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

1/25/2022: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUSSTATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANT'SDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; STATUS CONFERENCE POS...)

1/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; STATUS CONFERENCE POS...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/25/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; STATUS CONFERENCE POS...)

1/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; STATUS CONFERENCE POS...)

Status Conference Statement

1/18/2022: Status Conference Statement

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING THE BARLOW WAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY L. TURNER

1/19/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING THE BARLOW WAY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY L. TURNER

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER CLAIMS AND LAWSUITS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY L. TURNER

1/19/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER CLAIMS AND LAWSUITS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY L. TURNER

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY L. TURNER

1/19/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY L. TURNER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY L. TURNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION O

1/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRITTNEY L. TURNER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION O

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

1/20/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BIFURCATION OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND EXCLUSION OF CERTAIN EVIDENCE AT TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

1/20/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BIFURCATION OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND EXCLUSION OF CERTAIN EVIDENCE AT TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUD

1/20/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUD

Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

1/11/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

Separate Statement

1/11/2022: Separate Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/11/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Hearing06/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 40; Jury Trial (and Mandatory Settlement Conference pursuant to California Rules of Court 3.1380) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 40; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Status Conference; Non-Appearance Ca...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Statement; Filed by Katrina Millet (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 40; Status Conference (Post ADR) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Katrina Millet (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Katrina Millet (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Katrina Millet (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Katrina Millet (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Katrina Millet (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******5075 Hearing Date: August 25, 2021 Dept: 40

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Barlow Respiratory Hospital

Plaintiff Katrina Millet was formerly an employee of Defendant Barlow Respiratory Hospital. Plaintiff alleges Defendant discriminated against her because of alleged disabilities: She lists Dr. Henry S. Johnson as one of her medical providers.

Defendant served a business records subpoena on Dr. Johnson’s custodian of records and has also served Plaintiff with the required notice. Plaintiff has not filed any objections to the subpoena and Dr. Johnson’s office has not responded at all to the subpoena.

A business records subpoena may be served on a non-party. (CCP ; 2020.010.) The subpoenaing party must serve a “Notice to Consumer” to the consumer whose records are sought to allow them to object to the subpoena. (CCP ; ; 1985.3.) A court may order compliance with the subpoena. (CCP ; 1987.1.)

DEFENDANT’S MOTION IS GRANTED

Defendant has complied with the statutory requirements and the subpoena is unopposed by both Plaintiff or Dr. Johnson. Accordingly, Defendant’s Motion to Compel Dr. Johnson’s Compliance with Business Records Subpoena is GRANTED.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYON GEOFFREY C. ESQ.