This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2021 at 08:25:46 (UTC).

KATRINA GRANT VS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 KATRINA GRANT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0554

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANT KATRINA

Defendants

AVILA-MACIAS DIANA

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIROSYAN EDGAR

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/11/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/19/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/30/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF KATRINA GRANTS AND DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA, INC.S, JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS RESPONSI

12/2/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF KATRINA GRANTS AND DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA, INC.S, JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS RESPONSI

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PLAINTIFF KATRAINA GRANTS AND DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA, INC.S, JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS R

12/2/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PLAINTIFF KATRAINA GRANTS AND DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA, INC.S, JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS R

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/21/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/25/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/25/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF KATRINA GRANT?S AND DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA, INC.?S, JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS? RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE); Filed by Frontier Communications Corporation (Defendant); Frontier California, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (PLAINTIFF KATRAINA GRANT?S AND DEFENDANTS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION AND FRONTIER CALIFORNIA, INC.?S, JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS? RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE); Filed by Frontier Communications Corporation (Defendant); Frontier California, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Frontier Communications Corporation (Defendant); Frontier California, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Katrina Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Katrina Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Katrina Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Katrina Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Katrina Grant (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIROSYAN EDGAR