Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 01:28:32 (UTC).

KATIE YAU VS LEE & ASSOCIATES

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 KATIE YAU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LEE ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS, ANTHONY MOHR and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2167

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

ANTHONY MOHR

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

YAU KATIE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 5

LEE & ASSOCIATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MONTGOMERY MICHAEL B.

MONTGOMERY MICHAEL BRUCE

2627 Mission St #1

San Marino, CA 91108

SYLVA JULIA

Defendant Attorney

TAITELMAN MICHAEL ANDREW

1901 Ave. Of The Stars, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/7/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/8/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

1/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

1/31/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

2/7/2019: Minute Order

Notice

2/7/2019: Notice

Other -

10/17/2018: Other -

Certificate of Mailing for

10/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/5/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/15/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice

11/6/2018: Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/25/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order

10/25/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/22/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS

9/13/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/19/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

6/29/2018: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • at 09:15 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for failure to follow court' rules) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 09:15 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions of $950.00 on plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel for failure to appear or file case management statement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ) RE: (1) SANCTIONS; AND (2) DISMISSAL); Filed by Lee & Associate (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Katie Yau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Katie Yau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Lee & Associate (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Lee & Associate (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 10/22/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Lee & Associate (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Katie Yau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Katie Yau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE & ASSOCIATES COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC.-CITY OF INDUSTRY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAITELMAN MICHAEL A. ESQ.