This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2022 at 22:12:39 (UTC).

KATIE FERRARI VS CITY OF MONTEBELLO

Case Summary

On 08/27/2018 KATIE FERRARI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY OF MONTEBELLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN and LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9730

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERRARI KATIE

Defendant

CITY OF MONTEBELLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SALUTE KEVIN

SMITH GREGORY W.

Defendant Attorney

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

6/22/2022: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/7/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE AND NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL AND FSC DATES

6/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE AND NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL AND FSC DATES

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/14/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

12/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Substitution of Attorney

1/12/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/10/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/22/2022

2/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/22/2022

Notice of Trial - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FSC DATES

2/24/2022: Notice of Trial - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FSC DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/22/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMOTE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 05/24/2021

5/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMOTE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 05/24/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOTE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

5/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOTE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A COURT ORDER TO ATTEND A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE JAMES DUNN

4/26/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A COURT ORDER TO ATTEND A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE JAMES DUNN

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • Hearing01/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Hearing01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice and Notice of Continued Trial and FSC Dates; Filed by: Katie Ferrari (Plaintiff); As to: Katie Ferrari (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/12/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial (6 day estimate) scheduled for 07/26/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/24/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI): Status Date changed from 06/22/2022 to 06/22/2022; Result Date changed from 06/22/2022 to 06/22/2022; As To Parties changed from Katie Ferrari (Plaintiff) to Katie Ferrari (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI); Signed and Filed by: City of Montebello (Defendant); As to: Katie Ferrari (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI): Filed By: City of Montebello (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 51 - Hon. Upinder S. Kalraeffective 06/20/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 updated: Result Date to 11/29/2018; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-11-29 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Katie Ferrari (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2018
  • DocketAddress for Gregory W Smith (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Gregory W Smith (Attorney): First Name: Gregory; Last Name: Smith; Organization Name changed from Law Offices of Gregory W. Smith to Law Offices of Gregory W Smith; Middle Name: W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Katie Ferrari (Plaintiff); As to: Montebello, City of (Defendant); Service Date: 10/09/2018; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Conference-Case Management 11/29/18 at 8:30 am Dennis J. Landin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other Employment Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF MONTEBELLO A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION