This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 10:42:56 (UTC).

KATHY WU VS SUNRIDER CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 KATHY WU filed an Other lawsuit against SUNRIDER CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3303

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WU KATHY

Respondents and Defendants

CHEN TEI-FU

SUNRIDER CORPORATION

SUNRIDER INTERNATIONAL

CHEN OI-LIN

DOES 1 TO 100

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LINDEMANN LAW FIRM APC

APC LINDEMANN LAW FIRM

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

KELLEY DRYE & WARREN LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice

10/6/2017: Notice

SUMMONS

5/31/2017: SUMMONS

ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION

5/31/2017: ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION

Minute Order

6/8/2017: Minute Order

Status Report

6/8/2017: Status Report

Notice

6/20/2017: Notice

Notice

6/30/2017: Notice

Minute Order

8/1/2017: Minute Order

Notice

8/9/2017: Notice

Notice

8/31/2017: Notice

Minute Order

9/28/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2017

Notice -NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2017

Notice; Filed by Kathy Wu (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2017

Notice; Filed by Kathy Wu (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2017

at 08:30 AM in Department 311; Unknown Event Type - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2017

Minute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2017

Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Sunrider Corporation (Defendant); Tei-Fu Chen (Defendant); Oi-Lin Chen (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2017

Notice -JOINT NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2017

at 2:00 PM in Department 311; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2017

Notice; Filed by Kathy Wu (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2017

Notice -NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
06/30/2017

Notice; Filed by Sunrider Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2017

Notice NOTICE RE: COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2017

Notice; Filed by Kathy Wu (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2017

at 08:30 AM in Department 311; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2017

Minute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2017

Status Report INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2017

Order; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2017

ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2017

SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2017

Complaint; Filed by Kathy Wu (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less