This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2020 at 01:30:20 (UTC).

KATHY PAULINE MORRIS VS HAKOB BABAJANYAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 KATHY PAULINE MORRIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAKOB BABAJANYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5885

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MORRIS KATHY PAULINE

Defendants and Respondents

ARUTYUNYAN ARSEN

DOES 1 TO 100

TLA LIMOUSINE INCORPORATION

BABAJANYAN HAKOB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ZAVIDOW ROBERT M. ESQ.

CUTTING STACEY RAE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BECHERER KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

SAWYER DONAVON J.

MILANFAR SHAHRAD

 

Court Documents

Witness List

2/19/2020: Witness List

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER: MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS DES...) OF 02/24/2020

2/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER: MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS DES...) OF 02/24/2020

Statement of the Case

2/13/2020: Statement of the Case

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S NO. 3

2/13/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S NO. 3

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S NO. 5

2/13/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S NO. 5

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DONAVON SAWYER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS STATUS REPORT REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE HYMAN GROSS, M.D. FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL

2/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DONAVON SAWYER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS STATUS REPORT REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE HYMAN GROSS, M.D. FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/28/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATED EXPERT) OF 12/09/2019

12/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATED EXPERT) OF 12/09/2019

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE GROSS

11/27/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE GROSS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AUGMENT EXPERT DESIGNATION)

11/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AUGMENT EXPERT DESIGNATION)

Motion to Augment - MOTION TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE

10/18/2019: Motion to Augment - MOTION TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DONAVON SAWYER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESSES, AND EVIDENCE THAT WERE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY

9/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DONAVON SAWYER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESSES, AND EVIDENCE THAT WERE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF UNPAID MEDICAL BILLS PURSUANT TO HOWELL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

9/26/2019: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF UNPAID MEDICAL BILLS PURSUANT TO HOWELL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES, EXPERT WITNESSES, AND EVIDENCE THAT WERE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY; [PROPOSED] ORDER

9/26/2019: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES, EXPERT WITNESSES, AND EVIDENCE THAT WERE NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Statement of the Case

9/20/2019: Statement of the Case

Exhibit List

9/20/2019: Exhibit List

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

6/21/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Hearing03/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docketat 11:08 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: May 27, 2020) of 04/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: May 27, 2020)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF KATHY PAULINE MORRIS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by KATHY PAULINE MORRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by KATHY PAULINE MORRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by KATHY PAULINE MORRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KATHY PAULINE MORRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC665885    Hearing Date: February 21, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

kathy pauline morris,

Plaintiff,

v.

hakob babajanyan, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC665885

Hearing Date: February 21, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Motion to exclude plaintiff’s Designated Expert

Defendants Hakob Babajanyan and TLA Limousine, Inc. (“Defendants”) move to preclude Plaintiff Kathy Pauline Morris (“Plaintiff”) from calling her expert, Dr. Hyman Gross, M.D. (“Dr. Gross”), as a witness at trial because Plaintiff had not made Dr. Gross available for a deposition. In the alternative, Defendants seek to compel the deposition of Dr. Gross. The Court previously considered the motion on December 9, 2019, and continued the hearing to this date.

A court must exclude the expert opinion of any expert if the party offering that expert fails to make the expert available for deposition. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2034.300, subd. (d).) Defendants concede that they took Gross’s deposition on February 4, 2020. (Declaration of Donavon Sawyer in Support of Status Report, ¶ 4.) Accordingly, the motion is denied.

Defendants now argue that the Court should preclude Gross’s testimony on other grounds. The Court cannot consider these arguments, as Defendants raised them for the first time in their February 6, 2019 filing rather than a noticed motion. Moreover, as far as the Court is concerned, the dispositive issue—Dr. Gross’s deposition—has been resolved. Therefore, the Court denies Defendants’ motion.

Plaintiff does not request sanctions. Defendants’ request for sanctions is denied. The Court finds that responsibility for this dispute lies equally with both parties. The parties should have resolved this issue without court intervention. Therefore, an award of sanctions for either party would be unjust.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendants’ motion to exclude Dr. Gross as a witness at trial is denied. Defendants’ request for sanctions is denied. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: February 21, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC665885    Hearing Date: February 14, 2020    Dept: 32

Kathy Pauline Morries v. Hakob Babajanyan

Case No. BC665885

The final status conference and motions hearing is continued to Friday, February 21, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Case Number: BC665885    Hearing Date: December 11, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

kathy pauline morris,

Plaintiff,

v.

hakob babajanyan, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC665885

Hearing Date: December 11, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Motion to exclude plaintiff’s Designated Expert

Defendants Hakob Babajanyan and TLA Limousine, Inc. (“Defendants”) move to preclude Plaintiff Kathy Pauline Morris (“Plaintiff”) from calling her expert Hyman Gross, M.D. (“Gross”) as a witness at trial. Trial is set for March 3, 2019. Therefore, the Court continues the hearing on this motion to the date of the final status conference: February 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Defendants are ordered to file a status report on February 7, 2020, informing the Court whether the motion is off-calendar as moot or whether the Court must decide the motion. The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.

DATED: December 11, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court