This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 11:37:14 (UTC).

KATHY DARDASHTY, ET AL. VS NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 KATHY DARDASHTY, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0937

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DARDASHTY DAVID

DARDASHTY KATHY

Defendants

INFINITI OF VAN NUYS

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA

Defendant Attorney

SWEENEY MICHAEL P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/12/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

10/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/6/2023: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • Hearing01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/20/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: DAVID DARDASHTY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: DAVID DARDASHTY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: DAVID DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: KATHY DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); DAVID DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); As to: INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/11/2022; Service Cost: 86.55; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: KATHY DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); DAVID DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant); Service Date: 08/11/2022; Service Cost: 86.55; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KATHY DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); DAVID DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant); INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KATHY DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); DAVID DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant); INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KATHY DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); DAVID DARDASHTY (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC (Defendant); INFINITI OF VAN NUYS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITI OF VAN NUYS is a litigant

Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEENEY MICHAEL P