This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 19:45:04 (UTC).

KATHRYN STROM VS STOCKDALE MANAGEMENT, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 KATHRYN STROM filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against STOCKDALE MANAGEMENT, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4954

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STROM KATHRYN

Defendants

9090 WILSHIRE LP

9900 WILSHIRE LP

CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CARE FOUNDATION

CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

CPI/SCP MEDICAL OFFICE VENTURES GP LLC

JONES LANG LASALLE

STOCKDALE CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC

STOCKDALE MANAGEMENT LLC

WBCMT 2006-C27 OFFICE 8942 LP

ABLE BUILDING MAINTENANCE CO.

ABLE ENGINEERING SERVICES

AIR TEC MECHANICAL

ANDERSON PLUMBING

CENTERLINE ELECTRIC

CHEM PRO LABORATORY INC.

CSI SCAFFOLDING

ENVIRONMENTAL TESTING ASSOCIATES

HCI SYSTEMS INC.

PACIFIC NATIONAL GROUP

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FINCK TERRY

DE LA PENA GREGORY R.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

3/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2024
  • Hearing07/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2024
  • Hearing01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kathryn Strom (Plaintiff); As to: Stockdale Management, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 02/22/2023; Service Cost: 215.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kathryn Strom (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars Sinai Medical Care Foundation (Defendant); Service Date: 02/22/2023; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kathryn Strom (Plaintiff); As to: Stockdale Capital Partners, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 02/22/2023; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Kathryn Strom (Plaintiff); As to: Able Building Maintenance Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Kathryn Strom (Plaintiff); As to: PSI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Kathryn Strom (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific National Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Kathryn Strom (Plaintiff); As to: Pestgon Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kathryn Strom (Plaintiff); As to: Stockdale Management, LLC (Defendant); Stockdale Capital Partners, LLC (Defendant); Cedars Sinai Medical Center (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kathryn Strom (Plaintiff); As to: Stockdale Management, LLC (Defendant); Stockdale Capital Partners, LLC (Defendant); Cedars Sinai Medical Center (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kathryn Strom (Plaintiff); As to: Stockdale Management, LLC (Defendant); Stockdale Capital Partners, LLC (Defendant); Cedars Sinai Medical Center (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less